Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 16:25:02 (UTC).

RUEDA, JUAN vs. OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 RUEDA, JUAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0296

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RUEDA, SUSAN

RUEDA, JUAN

Defendant

OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAVER, GLENN FREDERICK

Defendant Attorney

GUTTERMAN, MARC J

 

Court Documents

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/17/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

3/17/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/17/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

3/16/2017: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4451.1344 / 2017071419)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO EXPERT INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS UNDER RULE 1.351

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING \ DEFENDANT'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/17/2017 FOR OLYMPUS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: GAVER, GLENN FREDERICK ASSIGNED TO RUEDA, JUAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/16/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-0296

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Olympus Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutterman, Marc Jason