This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 12/20/2021 at 11:13:56 (UTC).

REGIONS BANK vs. MONG, TAMRA

Case Summary

On 07/15/2011 REGIONS BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MONG, TAMRA. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1125

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REGIONS BANK

Defendants

MONG, KENNETH D

MALLARD LANDING HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

MONG, TAMRA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERSOHN, LEAH HEATHER

Defendant Attorney

CORINIS, JENNIFER W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2013

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE O.R. 3814 PG 1382 - 1383

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2013

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2013

DocketEntry: +++COT ISSUED / SENT TO RECORDING+++

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: CLERKS OFFICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF SALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

DocketEntry: FORECLOSURE BID SHEET- PLAINTIFF $100

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2013039101

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2013

DocketEntry: FORECLOSURE SALE ASSESSED $70.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2013

DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/01/2013

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FORECLOSURESALE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
78 More Docket Entries
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J. MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MAYERSOHN, LEAH ASSIGNED TO REGIONS BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS @

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY / MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: CIVIL ADDITIONAL DEF'S ASSESSED $5.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: FORECLOSURE $50000 TO $250000 ASSESSED $905.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $80.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2011

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/15/2011 CASE NUMBER CA11-1125

[+] Read More [-] Read Less