This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/29/2021 at 06:33:10 (UTC).

RAMIREZ, CHRISTOPHER vs. MACIO, SHARLIEN

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 RAMIREZ, CHRISTOPHER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against MACIO, SHARLIEN. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTHONY, JOAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1577

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ANTHONY, JOAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIREZ, CHRISTOPHER

Respondent

MACIO, SHARLIEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GONZALEZ COSTA, YVETTE B

Respondent Attorneys

1 NADEAU, BANDA DELANE

2 RUPPEL, CHARLES W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: ANTHONY, JOAN; Location: Courtroom 355

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: ANTHONY, JOAN; Location: Courtroom 355; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ATTORNEYS OF RECORD ORDER DISCHARGING GUARDIAN AD LITEM PROGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DISCHARGING GUARDIAN AD LITEM PROGRAM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: DIV 57 JA - ANTHONY, JOAN MOTION TO DISCHARGE GUARDIAN AD LITEM PROGRAM FROM FAMILY LAW CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISCHARGE GUARDIAN AD LITEM PROGRAM FROM FAMILY LAW CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAILED/MAILED TO PARTIES LISTED CONSENT ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
111 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY OR DISESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUIRED INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT FOR FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE SUMMARY FROM MIAMI-DADE COUNTY, FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: RUPPEL, CHARLES W ASSIGNED TO MACIO, SHARLIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE ALEXANDER, JOHN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PATERNITY-PRIV ATTY OR INDIV ASSESSED $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/27/2020 CASE NUMBER DR20-1577

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less