This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 12/17/2021 at 00:15:29 (UTC).

RAISOR, JOSEPH AARON vs. TERRY, SHEA E

Case Summary

On 09/15/2010 RAISOR, JOSEPH AARON filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against TERRY, SHEA E. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALEXANDER, JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1590

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALEXANDER, JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAISOR, JOSEPH AARON

Defendant

TERRY, SHEA E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAKOFKA, DAVID A

Defendant Attorney

MCCUNE, JAMES PATRICK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2014

HearingEvent: OTSC; Judge: ALEXANDER, JOHN; Location: Courtroom 365

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2014

DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2014

DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2014

DocketEntry: PETITION TO CORRECT SCRIVENER'S ERROR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2014

DocketEntry: OTSC SET FOR 09/29/2014 AT 9:00 AM IN 365/ , JDG: ALEXANDER, JOHN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2014

DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2014

DocketEntry: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2014

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT/ENFORCEMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2014

DocketEntry: CASE REOPENED FOR MC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/12/2014

DocketEntry: CHANGE OF NAME / ADDRESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
94 More Docket Entries
08/02/2002

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE 080602/LB

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: NTC OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED 80102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION POSITIVE DIVORCERESOLUTION 80102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: FL DL JOSEPH RAISOR 80102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: NTC SOCIAL SECURITY NO JOSEPH RAISER 80102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT AFFIDAVIT080102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT HUSBAND 080102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET 080102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2002

DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATEDRELIEF 080102-DC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/01/0001

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOSEPH AARON RAISOR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less