This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/06/2021 at 21:43:54 (UTC).

PRO JAX ROOFING INC A/A/O MICHAEL PIERSZTEL vs. TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/09/2020 PRO JAX ROOFING INC A/A/O MICHAEL PIERSZTEL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0648

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRO JAX ROOFING INC A/A/O MICHAEL PIERSZTEL

Defendant

TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NANKISSORE, ARUNA D

Defendant Attorneys

MUSA, JOSE A

LITTLE, BRADLEY L

 

Court Documents

4/16/2021

33: 4/16/2021

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION & AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

2/2/2021: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION & AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 2, 2021 @ 11:00 AM

1/27/2021: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 2, 2021 @ 11:00 AM

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 02, 2021 AT 11:00AM

1/25/2021: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 02, 2021 AT 11:00AM

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

1/22/2021: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

10/26/2020

25: 10/26/2020

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/09/2020 FOR TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

6/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/09/2020 FOR TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT

6/9/2020: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LITTLE, BRADLEY L ASSIGNED TO TOWER HILL SIGNATURE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: MALTZ, HOWARD M.; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD, DIRECTIONS TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION & AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 2, 2021 @ 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 02, 2021 AT 11:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - FEBRUARY 2, 2021 AT 11:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: NANKISSORE, ARUNA D ASSIGNED TO PRO JAX ROOFING INC A/A/O MICHAEL PIERSZTEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/09/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0648

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill SIgnature Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nankissore, Aruna D