This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/29/2021 at 07:51:21 (UTC).

PRICE, HEATHER vs. BRANTHOOVER, WILLIAM ALEXANDER

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 PRICE, HEATHER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against BRANTHOOVER, WILLIAM ALEXANDER. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENDZIO, BRYAN R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1592

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENDZIO, BRYAN R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRICE, HEATHER

Respondent

BRANTHOOVER, WILLIAM ALEXANDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • HearingEvent: INJUNCTION HEARING; Judge: RENDZIO, BRYAN R.; Location: Courtroom 355; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RETURN OF SERVICE. FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: SJSO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT DR20-1592, FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITHOUT MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAILED TO PARTIES LISTED ORDER CONTINUING SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER CONTINUING SUBPOENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • HearingEvent: INJUNCTION HEARING; Judge: RENDZIO, BRYAN R.; Location: Courtroom 355; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: INJUNCTION HEARING SET FOR 12/21/2020 AT 8:15 AM IN 355/ , JDG: RENDZIO, BRYAN R.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER CONTINUING TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: SJSO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT DR20-1592, TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: 58 JA RENDZIO, BRYAN R. REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT DR20-1592, PROPOSED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: INJUNCTION INFO SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: SHERIFF'S INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE RENDZIO, BRYAN R.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/29/2020 CASE NUMBER DR20-1592

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less