This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 09/24/2022 at 18:05:43 (UTC).

PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DARIUS FAR vs. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DARIUS FAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2174

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DARIUS FAR

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWENS, DONALD RAY III

Defendant Attorney

BROCK, REBECCA LYNN

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/26/2022 FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

7/26/2022: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/26/2022 FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: OWENS, DONALD RAY III; BROCK, REBECCA LYNN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT SP22-2174, PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DARIUS FAR VS. PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY AGREED ORDER 9/6/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING PRE-TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BROCK, REBECCA LYNN ASSIGNED TO PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2022027568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/26/2022 FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 09/07/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: OWENS, DONALD RAY III ASSIGNED TO PRAGLE CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DARIUS FAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/26/2022 CASE NUMBER SP22-2174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brock, Rebecca L.