This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 06/04/2020 at 19:05:22 (UTC).

POKELWALDT, DANIEL vs. RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 POKELWALDT, DANIEL filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0299

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POKELWALDT, DANIEL

POKELWALDT, ANNE

Defendants

COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC

CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS AND SUPPLY INC

ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC

UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC

PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

STRANGE LATHING AND PLASTERING INC

RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZUDAR, JOSHUA MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

FERGUSON, ELIZABETH B

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/6/2020: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR STRANGE LATHING AND PLASTERING INC

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR STRANGE LATHING AND PLASTERING INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS AND SUPPLY LLC

3/9/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS AND SUPPLY LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FERGUSON, ELIZABETH B ASSIGNED TO UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FERGUSON, ELIZABETH B ASSIGNED TO PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FERGUSON, ELIZABETH B ASSIGNED TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP'S UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY, INC.'S AND PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S MOTION TO STAY OR ABATE PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP'S, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY, INC'S AND PARKER BROTHER CONSTRUCTION, INC'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 04/02/2020 FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $470.00 RECEIPT #2020008566

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR STRANGE LATHING AND PLASTERING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/09/2020 FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS AND SUPPLY LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ZUDAR, JOSHUA MICHAEL ASSIGNED TO POKELWALDT, ANNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ZUDAR, JOSHUA MICHAEL ASSIGNED TO POKELWALDT, DANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/06/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0299

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARKER BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC is a litigant