This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 07/14/2022 at 17:02:29 (UTC).

PITTS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DAWNA CANTWAY vs. ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 PITTS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DAWNA CANTWAY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1612

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PITTS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DAWNA CANTWAY

Defendant

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWENS, DONALD RAY III

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/16/2022 FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

6/16/2022: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/16/2022 FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2022022491

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 06/16/2022 FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 08/04/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: OWENS, DONALD RAY III ASSIGNED TO PITTS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC A/A/O DAWNA CANTWAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/16/2022 CASE NUMBER SP22-1612

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PITTS FAMILY CHIROPRACTIC OF OCALA is a litigant

Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III