Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/23/2021 at 17:04:56 (UTC).

PENSIERO, WAYNE vs. AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 PENSIERO, WAYNE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AVATAR PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0239

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PENSIERO, KAREN

PENSIERO, WAYNE

Defendant

AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN

BENNETT, JACKLYN G

Defendant Attorney

HANSON, ERIC RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES

3/1/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

2/24/2021: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/24/2021 FOR AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

2/24/2021: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/24/2021 FOR AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

2/23/2021: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

2/23/2021: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HANSON, ERIC RUSSELL ASSIGNED TO AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021006599

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/24/2021 FOR AVATAR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN ASSIGNED TO PENSIERO, WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HUNT, DAMIAN BROWN ASSIGNED TO PENSIERO, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BENNETT, JACKLYN G ASSIGNED TO PENSIERO, WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/23/2021 CASE NUMBER CA21-0239

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Avatar Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANSON , ERIC RUSSELL