Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 18:50:05 (UTC).

PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC vs. THOMAS, K

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against THOMAS, K. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1208

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC

Defendant

THOMAS, K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

1/17/2018: ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

CIVIL COURT NOTES

1/2/2018: CIVIL COURT NOTES

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/30/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURE SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

10/30/2017: APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURE SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-1208, PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC VS. THOMAS, K WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS-1/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING APPROVAL FOR TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING - FLORIDA AND TEXAS AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS SIGNED BY K. THOMAS ("TRANSFEROR") DATED DECEMBER 27, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING AND NOTICE OF FILING APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS - JANUARY 2, 2018 @ 9:45 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017036263

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: PETITT, RICHARD THOMAS ASSIGNED TO PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR COURT APPROVAL OF A TRANSFER OF STRUCTURE SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/30/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1208

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEACHTREE SETTLEMENT FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Petitt, Richard Thomas