This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/21/2022 at 18:11:49 (UTC).

ORTHO ONE A/A/O ALEXIS QUIVA vs. USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 ORTHO ONE A/A/O ALEXIS QUIVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3119

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORTHO ONE A/A/O ALEXIS QUIVA

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWENS, DONALD RAY III

Defendant Attorney

MENENDEZ, MATTHEW A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OR.5659.1211. / 2022101939)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MENENDEZ, MATTHEW A ASSIGNED TO USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE DESIGNATION OF PRINCIPAL E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 10/03/2022 FOR USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 11/04/2022 AT 1:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2022036209

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: OWENS, DONALD RAY III ASSIGNED TO ORTHO ONE A/A/O ALEXIS QUIVA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/22/2022 CASE NUMBER SP22-3119

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Menendez, Matthew Adam