This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 02/01/2022 at 19:06:11 (UTC).

NIENABER, LINDSAY vs. WOOD, CHARLES

Case Summary

On 07/15/2013 NIENABER, LINDSAY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WOOD, CHARLES. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1155

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NIENABER, LINDSAY

Defendants

WOOD, CHARLES

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE CO.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/17/2013

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.3803.764 / 2013069089)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2013

DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2013

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2013

DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS TO CHARLES WOOD RETURNED - PERSONALLY SERVED ON 09/23/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2013

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $20.00 RECEIPT #2013030993

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2013

DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $20.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2013

DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/27/2013

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/27/2013

DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY MAILED TO ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/16/2013

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2013025252

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2013

DocketEntry: AUTO NEGLIGENCE ASSESSED $400.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2013

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MONROE, JEFFREY W ASSIGNED TO NIENABER, LINDSAY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2013

DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/15/2013

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/15/2013 CASE NUMBER CA13-1155

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2013

DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2013

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2013

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less