This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/28/2021 at 06:58:38 (UTC).

NEWTON, CHRISTOPHER vs. NEWTON, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 NEWTON, CHRISTOPHER filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against NEWTON, JESSICA. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1576

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEWTON, CHRISTOPHER

Respondent

NEWTON, JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GILLIS, ADRIANNE M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT ON VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH PARENTING PLAN AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF - Recorded (OR.5420.1783 / 2021124403)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL TO PARTIES LISTED: FINAL JUDGMENT ON VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH PARENTING PLAN AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT ON VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH PARENTING PLAN AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: NOTICE OF ACTION; Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE ALEXANDER'S STANDING ORDER DTD 01/08/20 RE: ALL FAMILY CASES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ATTORNEY ON 10/27/2020 - JESSICA NEWTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: GILLIS, ADRIANNE M ASSIGNED TO NEWTON, CHRISTOPHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE RENDZIO, BRYAN R.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/27/2020 CASE NUMBER DR20-1576

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED PETITION TO ESTABLISH PARENTING PLAN AND CHILD SUPPORT AND OTHER RELATED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gillis, Adrianne M