This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/28/2021 at 05:13:46 (UTC).

MCMAHON, JENICE vs. SHEPHERD, ANDREW

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 MCMAHON, JENICE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SHEPHERD, ANDREW. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RENDZIO, BRYAN R.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1536

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RENDZIO, BRYAN R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCMAHON, JENICE

Respondent

SHEPHERD, ANDREW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RETURN OF SERVICE. FINAL JUDGMENT FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE. SERVED 11/25/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingEvent: INJUNCTION HEARING; Judge: RENDZIO, BRYAN R.; Location: Courtroom 355; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: SJSO REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT DR20-1536, FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: PRIBISCO, TIM A JR REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT DR20-1536, FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE WITH MINOR CHILD(REN) (AFTER NOTICE). EXP. 11/23/2025

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TO PREPARE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: 58 JA RENDZIO, BRYAN R. REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT DR20-1536, PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A VIOLATION OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL TO INJ CLERK: PETITIONER'S MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A VIOLATION OF TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: PRIBISCO, TIM A JR ASSIGNED TO MCMAHON, JENICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: LEGALLY INSUFFICIENT - PER ON CALL JUDGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: SHERIFF'S INFORMATION SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: INJUNCTION INFO SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT TO SECTION 61.501 FLORIDA STATUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE RENDZIO, BRYAN R.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR INJUNCTION - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/19/2020 CASE NUMBER DR20-1536

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less