This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 04/12/2022 at 17:32:37 (UTC).

MCDONALD, STEPHEN P vs. MCDONALD, JODY

Case Summary

On 06/04/1998 MCDONALD, STEPHEN P filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MCDONALD, JODY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ALEXANDER, JOHN and PRUGH, R MITCHELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0981

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ALEXANDER, JOHN

PRUGH, R MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCDONALD, STEPHEN P

Defendant

MCDONALD, JODY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MUSE, MARY KATRINA

Defendant Attorney

BURK - INACTIVE, SUSAN MARY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/22/2017

DocketEntry: TERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2016

DocketEntry: COMPUTATION OF ARREARAGES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/19/2015

DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CLERK OF COURT OF REQUIREMENT FOR COLLECTION OF ARREARS UPON EMANCIPATION OF MINOR CHILD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2013

DocketEntry: BALANCE ADJUSTMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2013

DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2013

DocketEntry: REOPENED CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/13/2013

DocketEntry: AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE CHILD SUPPORT HEARING OFFICER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2013

HearingEvent: CHILD SUPPORT HEARING; Judge: PRUGH, R MITCHELL; Location: Courtroom 228; Result: COMPLETED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2013

DocketEntry: JUDGE ALEXANDER, JOHN: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2013

DocketEntry: CHILD SUPPORT HEARING SET FOR 06/06/2013 AT 12:30 PM IN 228/ , JDG: PRUGH, R MITCHELL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
199 More Docket Entries
06/26/1998

DocketEntry: RESPONSENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER AND GENERAL DENIAL /063098T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER /060898-TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER /060898

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: FAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT-STEPHEN MCDONALD /060898T

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: DECLARATION UNDER THE UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTIONACT /060898-TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: INTRODUCTION TO INTERRS/INTERRS /060898-TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING-NOTICE/INTERRS, INTERRS, REQUEST/PRODUCTION /060898-TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF LONG ARM SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET /060898-TLH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/04/1998

DocketEntry: HUSBAND'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE /060898TH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less