This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 01/27/2023 at 18:27:26 (UTC).

MCCLURE, CHRISTOPHER HAL vs. MCCLURE, KERRY DONOVAN

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 MCCLURE, CHRISTOPHER HAL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MCCLURE, KERRY DONOVAN. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MENSH, DENISE and MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2087

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MENSH, DENISE

MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MCCLURE, CHRISTOPHER HAL

Respondent

MCCLURE, KERRY DONOVAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.5696.1469. / 2023004801)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO PETITIONER & RESPONDENT RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS & CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: MENSH, DENISE; Location: Courtroom 290; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEntry: RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDATIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MCGILLIN, HOWARD O JR: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: GM ASSIST, MCCLURE, KERRY DONOVAN REGARDING SERVICE OF ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE / MAILED TO PETITIONER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: STANDING FAMILY LAW ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE MALTZ'S STANDING ORDER DTD 12/08/20 RE: ALL FAMILY CASES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - NOT REPRESENTED BY ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: COPY OF DRIVER LICENSE - KERRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $408.00 RECEIPT #2022044055

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE ANTHONY, JOAN: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: DISS - PROSE W/O CHILDREN ASSESSED $408.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER DR22-2087

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH NO DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN) OR PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less