Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 01:16:26 (UTC).

MCCALL, HEATH S vs. MCCALL, MYRON E

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 MCCALL, HEATH S filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against MCCALL, MYRON E. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1316

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MCCALL, CARSON T

MCCALL, HEATH S

Defendant

MCCALL, MYRON E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRAZIER, WILLIAM ROBINSON III

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES

12/5/2017: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2017
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (CIVIL); Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Chambers; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - DECEMBER 7, 2017 AT 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017040050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: TRUST ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FRAZIER, WILLIAM ROBINSON III ASSIGNED TO MCCALL, CARSON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: FRAZIER, WILLIAM ROBINSON III ASSIGNED TO MCCALL, HEATH S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/05/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1316

    Read MoreRead Less