This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 09:04:26 (UTC).

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0125

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BELINDA LOUISE RUDOLPH

RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE

UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

GLEN ST JOHNS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANDERGRIFF, LEA W

Defendant Attorney

JOHNSON, KACEE L

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE MORTGAGE

1/29/2020: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE MORTGAGE

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - MAY 6, 2020 AT 8:30AM

2/4/2020: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - MAY 6, 2020 AT 8:30AM

PAYMENT $1,955.00 RECEIPT #2020003698

2/3/2020: PAYMENT $1,955.00 RECEIPT #2020003698

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.4875.386 / 2020007844)

1/31/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS - Recorded (OR.4875.386 / 2020007844)

ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

1/31/2020: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

1/31/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR UNKNOWN PERSON(S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR GLEN ST JOHNS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

1/31/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR GLEN ST JOHNS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

1/31/2020: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BELINDA LOUISE RUDOLPH

1/31/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BELINDA LOUISE RUDOLPH

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE

1/31/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FORECLOSURE); Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/06/2020 FOR FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: JOHNSON, KACEE L ASSIGNED TO FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE - FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL - Recorded (OR.4881.774 / 2020010849)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: VANDERGRIFF, LEA W REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0125, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS. RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 2/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/31/2020 FOR RUDOLPH, BELINDA LOUISE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: VANDERGRIFF, LEA W ASSIGNED TO JPMORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/30/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0125

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATION OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSURE MORTGAGE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vandergriff, Lea W.