Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 02:15:42 (UTC).

JEFFREY, JOHN vs. TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2017 JEFFREY, JOHN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1092

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEFFREY, GLORIA

JEFFREY, JOHN

Defendant

TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEWIS, ADAM MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

SLADE, KATHRYN N

 

Court Documents

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/26/2017 FOR TOWER HILL PREFFERED INSURANCE COMPANY

9/26/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/26/2017 FOR TOWER HILL PREFFERED INSURANCE COMPANY

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL

9/22/2017: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4513.1511 / 2018015673)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF FILING PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT TOWER PREFERRED SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED IINSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS AND OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SLADE, KATHRYN N ASSIGNED TO TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT TOWER HILL PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 09/26/2017 FOR TOWER HILL PREFFERED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/25/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR EXPEDITED JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Preferred Insurance Company is a litigant