This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/08/2023 at 03:13:22 (UTC).

INNOVATIVE PHYSIATRY SPINE CLINIC, LLC A/A/O JANA CRAMER vs. UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/01/2023 INNOVATIVE PHYSIATRY SPINE CLINIC, LLC A/A/O JANA CRAMER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLOCKER, LAUREN P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0383

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLOCKER, LAUREN P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INNOVATIVE PHYSIATRY SPINE CLINIC, LLC A/A/O JANA CRAMER

Defendant

UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

1 WINER, MELISSA RAKIN

2 SABEN, ADAM B

Defendant Attorney

LOVELADY, HILLARY H

 

Court Documents

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2023 FOR UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

2/1/2023: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2023 FOR UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: BLOCKER, LAUREN P; Location: Courtroom 228; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ADDRESS & E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL PURSUANT TO F.R.J.A. 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: LOVELADY, HILLARY H ASSIGNED TO UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO INVOKE THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 02/17/2023 FOR UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - ELECTRONIC DELIVERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2023004309

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SABEN, ADAM B ASSIGNED TO INNOVATIVE PHYSIATRY SPINE CLINIC, LLC A/A/O JANA CRAMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 02/01/2023 FOR UNITED AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 03/06/2023 AT 1:00 PM IN 228/ , JDG: BLOCKER, LAUREN P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: WINER, MELISSA RAKIN ASSIGNED TO INNOVATIVE PHYSIATRY SPINE CLINIC, LLC A/A/O JANA CRAMER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE BLOCKER, LAUREN P: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/01/2023 CASE NUMBER SP23-0383

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less