This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 09/14/2021 at 18:04:32 (UTC).

INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O JOSHUA WILLIAMS vs. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O JOSHUA WILLIAMS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TINLIN, CHARLES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2434

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TINLIN, CHARLES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O JOSHUA WILLIAMS

Defendant

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OWENS, DONALD RAY III

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

7/16/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

7/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

7/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT

7/16/2021: COMPLAINT

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/16/2021 FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

7/16/2021: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/16/2021 FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC); Judge: TINLIN, CHARLES; Location: Courtroom 216

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $90.00 RECEIPT #2021025237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/16/2021 FOR LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL HEARING (SP/CC) SET FOR 09/27/2021 AT 1:00 PM IN 216/ , JDG: TINLIN, CHARLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: OWENS, DONALD RAY III ASSIGNED TO INNOVATIVE OPEN MRI A/A/O JOSHUA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TINLIN, CHARLES: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/16/2021 CASE NUMBER SP21-2434

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III