This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 09/23/2022 at 01:33:01 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: ZIMMERMAN, JACLYN SARA

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 IN THE INTEREST OF ZIMMERMAN, JACLYN SARA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANESK, KENNETH J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0508

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANESK, KENNETH J

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified, Petitioners and Trustees

ZIMMERMAN, STEPHEN J.

STEPHEN J. ZIMMERMAN AS TRUSTEE OF THE JACLYN S. ZIMMERMAN REVOCABLE TRUST DATED AUGUST 7 2003 AS AMENDED AND RESTATED ON NOVEMBER 10 2011 AND FIRST AMENDMENT DATED OCTOBER 14 2013 (THE "REVOCABLE TRUST")

KLIEGERMAN, LOREN J.

SACKS, BARRIE L.

Decedent

ZIMMERMAN, JACLYN SARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

KANE, KEVIN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING FINAL ACCOUNTING & PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: KANE, KEVIN A REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP21-0508, IN THE INTEREST OF: ZIMMERMAN, JACLYN SARA WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: NOTICE TO FILE FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE - KEVIN A. KANE -8/8/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILE FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE - KEVIN A. KANE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILE FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE - STEPHEN J. ZIMMERMAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEntry: INVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: KANE, KEVIN A REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP21-0508, IN THE INTEREST OF: ZIMMERMAN, JACLYN SARA: NOTICE OF TRUST-8/11/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TRUST

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021026188

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KANE, KEVIN A ASSIGNED TO ZIMMERMAN, STEPHEN J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE JANESK, KENNETH J: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/22/2021 CASE NUMBER CP21-0508

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less