Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/17/2020 at 23:30:36 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: XYNIDIS, DESPINA B

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 IN THE INTEREST OF XYNIDIS, DESPINA B was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0767

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

XYNIDIS, NICHOLAS

XYNDIS, STATHIS

XYNIDIS, MICHAEL A

Claimant

WELLS FARGO BANK / WACHOVIA BANK

Decedent

XYNIDIS, DESPINA B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

ROBERTS, TANCE ELIZABETH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: OBJECTION TO CLAIM - WELLS FARGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ROBERTS, TANCE ELIZABETH REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP19-0767, IN THE INTEREST OF: XYNIDIS, DESPINA B WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY-2/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO EXTEND TIME FOR FILING INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ROBERTS, TANCE ELIZABETH REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP19-0767, IN THE INTEREST OF: XYNIDIS, DESPINA B WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.-1/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: T. DAVIS REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP19-0767, IN THE INTEREST OF: XYNIDIS, DESPINA B -BENEFICIARY AND SON OF THE DECEDENT, STATHIS XYNIDIS'S OBJECTION TO PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION AND THE AMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION REGARDING NICHOLAS XYNIDIS BEING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AS NICHOLAS XYNIDIS IS NOT COMPETENT, NOR QUALIFIED TO SERVE AS THE PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE; AND A MOTION TO VACATE THE ORDER OF THE COURT APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE-1/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019042334

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: ROBERTS, TANCE ELIZABETH ASSIGNED TO XYNIDIS, NICHOLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/18/2019 CASE NUMBER CP19-0767

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO NA REGISTERED AGENT OR OWNER CORPORATION SERVICE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS, TANCE ELIZABETH