Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 06/02/2020 at 19:07:30 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: THOMPSON, EARL ARTHUR

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 IN THE INTEREST OF THOMPSON, EARL ARTHUR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0159

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

THOMPSON, JUNE JESTER

WARMAN, CYNTHIA

TILLOTSON, MELANIE

THOMPSON, DANIEL RAYMOND

Claimant

BANK OF AMERICA ACCOUNT ENDING 6061

Decedent

THOMPSON, EARL ARTHUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

SHAW, STEPHEN FULTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: ++NEED OATH++

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION RECEIPT OF A COPY OF THE LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT OF EARL ARTHUR THOMPSON AND A COPY OF THE PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION- ALL WAIVERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: SHAW, STEPHEN FULTON REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP20-0159, IN THE INTEREST OF: THOMPSON, EARL ARTHUR WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: STATEMENT OF CLAIM-5/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - BANK OF AMERICA N.A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL WILL AND DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SHAW, STEPHEN FULTON ASSIGNED TO THOMPSON, JUNE JESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SHAW, STEPHEN FULTON ASSIGNED TO THOMPSON, JUNE JESTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020007948

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/10/19 RE: ALL PROBATE & GUARDIANSHIP CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/04/2020 CASE NUMBER CP20-0159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR FORMAL ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (COPY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant