Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 05/28/2020 at 19:05:26 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: TENOSO, EDWIN E

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 IN THE INTEREST OF TENOSO, EDWIN E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0146

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

TENOSO, KATHLEEN R

TENOSO, ERIC

Decedent

TENOSO, EDWIN E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

MILLER, CLAYTON T

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - Recorded (OR.4895.1166 / 2020017509)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.4895.1149 / 2020017507)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MILLER, CLAYTON T REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP20-0146, IN THE INTEREST OF: TENOSO, EDWIN E WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION-3/4/2020,ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE-3/4/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020007326

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/10/19 RE: ALL PROBATE & GUARDIANSHIP CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MILLER, CLAYTON T ASSIGNED TO TENOSO, KATHLEEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: MILLER, CLAYTON T ASSIGNED TO TENOSO, KATHLEEN R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/28/2020 CASE NUMBER CP20-0146

    Read MoreRead Less