Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 00:19:53 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: OBROCHTA, AGNES

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF OBROCHTA, AGNES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0413

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

OBROCHTA, STANLEY J

KACZMARCZYK, ALEXANDRA M

ADAMCZYK, MARY S

NANNINI, ANNA K

Decedent

OBROCHTA, AGNES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

JOHNSON, MARSHA SHARLENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.4528.72 / 2018023174)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: JOHNSON, MARSHA SHARLENE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0413, IN THE INTEREST OF: OBROCHTA, AGNES WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER OF DISCHARGE-4/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING AND OF SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND RECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: DECEASED W/FORMAL ADMIN-UNCONT ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/05/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (INTESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHNSON , MARSHA SHARLENE