Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 04/30/2020 at 19:06:48 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: MERRY, JOYCE ANN

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 IN THE INTEREST OF MERRY, JOYCE ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

ROBERTS, KENNETH G

Claimant

STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

Decedent

MERRY, JOYCE ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

HINSON, MATTHEW H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.4880.1933 / 2020010654)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - Recorded (OR.4880.1928 / 2020010653)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: HINSON, MATTHEW H REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP20-0079, IN THE INTEREST OF: MERRY, JOYCE ANN - LETTERS/ORDER ADMITTING WILL -2/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HINSON, MATTHEW H ASSIGNED TO ROBERTS, KENNETH G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HINSON, MATTHEW H ASSIGNED TO ROBERTS, KENNETH G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/10/19 RE: ALL PROBATE & GUARDIANSHIP CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/31/2020 CASE NUMBER CP20-0079

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - TESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hinson, Matthew Howard