Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 23:11:57 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: KLEIN, PHYLLIS C

Case Summary

On 04/18/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF KLEIN, PHYLLIS C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0246

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

CAMERON, SCOTT C

MENDENHALL, JILL LYNNE

Decedent

KLEIN, PHYLLIS C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.4478.1940 / 2017085857)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0246, IN THE INTEREST OF: KLEIN, PHYLLIS C WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: P97-12/19/2017-DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCAHRGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE: RECIEPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF ACCOUNTING, PORTIONS OF PETITION FOR DISCHARGE AND SERVICE OF PETITION FOR DISCAHRGE: RECIEPT OF BENEFICIARY AND CONSENT TO DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017013479

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: DECEASED W/FORMAL ADMIN-UNCONT ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (INTESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN ASSIGNED TO CAMERON, SCOTT C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/18/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0246

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES E BEDSOLE