Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 20:12:43 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: KELEMEN, ROSE SEPE

Case Summary

On 06/14/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF KELEMEN, ROSE SEPE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0372

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

JARRARD, AUDREY

Not Yet Classified

EVANS, MICHELE

KELEMEN, JEANE

KELEMEN, BILL

HAAKE, ANN S

JARRARD, AUDREY

BUNCH, AUDREY

MANNERINO, PHYLLIS SEPE

BUNCH, CARLY

KELEMEN, TOM

SMITH, LAURA COAN

FELTNER, ARTA S

SEPE, BETTY

Decedent

KELEMEN, ROSE SEPE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.4735.195 / 2019038744)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0372, IN THE INTEREST OF: KELEMEN, ROSE SEPE - ORDER OF DISCHARGE -6/4/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S RECIEPT FOR FINAL PAYMENT TO BENEFICIARY MICHELE EVANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S RECIEPT FOR FINAL PAYMENT TO BENEFICIARY LAURA COAN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN; JARRARD, AUDREY REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0372, IN THE INTEREST OF: KELEMEN, ROSE SEPE - ORDER DENYING OBJECTION -5/8/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DENYING OBJECTION TO PETTION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (PROBATE); Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN ASSIGNED TO JARRARD, AUDREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN ASSIGNED TO JARRARD, AUDREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BEDSOLE, JAMES EDWIN ASSIGNED TO KELEMEN, ROSE SEPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/14/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0372

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JAMES E BEDSOLE