Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 22:50:49 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: HIGGINBOTHAM, ELIZABETH A

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 IN THE INTEREST OF HIGGINBOTHAM, ELIZABETH A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and BOATWRIGHT, JOE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0118

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

BOATWRIGHT, JOE

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

TONEY, RITA M

WALKER, RANDA

Decedent

HIGGINBOTHAM, ELIZABETH A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CONNER, ROBIN H

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (PROBATE); Judge: BOATWRIGHT, JOE; Location: Courtroom 228; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.4920.211 / 2020028168)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CONNER, ROBIN H REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP20-0118, IN THE INTEREST OF: HIGGINBOTHAM, ELIZABETH A -ORDER OF SUMMARY -4/9/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING - APRIL 17, 2020 @ 3:45PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CONNER, ROBIN H REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP20-0118, IN THE INTEREST OF: HIGGINBOTHAM, ELIZABETH A WITH 0 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: JUDGES NOTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2020005756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING (JUDGE SMITH STANDING ORDER DTD 01/09/19 RE: ALL CIVIL CASES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CONNER, ROBIN H ASSIGNED TO TONEY, RITA M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/18/2020 CASE NUMBER CP20-0118

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONNER, ROBIN H