Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:17:31 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: GUTEKUNST, ROBERTA H

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF GUTEKUNST, ROBERTA H was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0198

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

WONG, NANCY D

ROBERT HOOD GUTEKUNST REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST

Decedent

GUTEKUNST, ROBERTA H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

BOLES, JOSEPH LESTER JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.4555.226 / 2018037458)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BOLES, JOSEPH LESTER JR REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0198, IN THE INTEREST OF: GUTEKUNST, ROBERTA H WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: P97-5/31/2018-ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BOLES, JOSEPH LESTER JR REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0198, IN THE INTEREST OF: GUTEKUNST, ROBERTA H WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: @NFP-5/2/2018-NOTICE TO FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILE FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017011885

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BOLES, JOSEPH LESTER JR ASSIGNED TO GUTEKUNST, ROBERTA H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: DECEASED W/FORMAL ADMIN-UNCONT ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/30/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOLES, JOSEPH LESTER JR