This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/20/2022 at 19:09:01 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: GARRETT, WINTON JR

Case Summary

On 08/22/2022 IN THE INTEREST OF GARRETT, WINTON JR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANESK, KENNETH J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0612

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANESK, KENNETH J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

IRWIN, MALINDA

Decedent

GARRETT, WINTON JR

Not Yet Classified

GARRETT, BRYAN W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KANE, KEVIN A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - RECORDED (OR.5623.42. / 2022082301)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: KANE, KEVIN A REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP22-0612, IN THE INTEREST OF: GARRETT, WINTON JR WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY -8/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $231.00 RECEIPT #2022031719

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KANE, KEVIN A ASSIGNED TO IRWIN, MALINDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE JANESK, KENNETH J: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY- INTESTATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/22/2022 CASE NUMBER CP22-0612

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less