Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:27:31 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: FLOYD, JOHN QUINCY J

Case Summary

On 12/29/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF FLOYD, JOHN QUINCY J was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0781

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

O'NEILL, JANICE FLOYD

Claimant

RAULERSON HOSPITAL

Not Yet Classified

FLOYD, GERALD ALLEN

O'NEILL, JANICE FLOYD

STRAUSS, GLORIA

FLOYD, JOHN MACK

Decedent

FLOYD, JOHN QUINCY J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

PATROU, SCOTT M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: PATROU, SCOTT M REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0781, IN THE INTEREST OF: FLOYD, JOHN QUINCY J - ORDER OF DISCHARGE -1/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE'S PROOF OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF FINAL ACCOUTNING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: PATROU, SCOTT M ASSIGNED TO O'NEILL, JANICE FLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: PATROU, SCOTT M ASSIGNED TO O'NEILL, JANICE FLOYD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: PATROU, SCOTT M ASSIGNED TO FLOYD, JOHN QUINCY J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/29/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0781

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF DEATH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE AND RESIDENT AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAULERSON HOSPITAL is a litigant