Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 19:18:39 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: DANDRIDGE, BARBARA ANN

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF DANDRIDGE, BARBARA ANN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0663

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

MADDEN, HOLLY

MADDEN, MELISSA N

DANDRIDGE, MARTIN D

BELLINO, MARION E

Claimant

FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT

Decedent

DANDRIDGE, BARBARA ANN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ICKES, JULIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ICKES, JULIE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0663, IN THE INTEREST OF: DANDRIDGE, BARBARA ANN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT-1/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - Recorded (OR.4457.934 / 2017074345)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.4457.932 / 2017074344)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.4457.930 / 2017074343)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ICKES, JULIE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0663, IN THE INTEREST OF: DANDRIDGE, BARBARA ANN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: P21-11/2/2017- ORDER ADMITTING WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ICKES, JULIE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0663, IN THE INTEREST OF: DANDRIDGE, BARBARA ANN WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: P97-11/2/2017,P21-11/2/2017- ORDER OF SUMMARY/ORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/01/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING- PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (TESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less