Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 13:33:34 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: CONWAY, KENNETH MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF CONWAY, KENNETH MICHAEL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0464

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CONWAY, KIMBERLY ANN

Claimants

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

ST JOHNS COUNTY FIRE AND RESCUE

Decedent

CONWAY, KENNETH MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ST JOHNS COUNTY FIRE AND RESCUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT WILL - Recorded (OR.4410.140 / 2017051268)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2017025354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAID FUNERAL BILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: LEASE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: MORGAN STANLEY SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: DECEASED W/ADM-SUMM >$1000 ASSESSED $345.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/25/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0464

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOHNS COUNTY FIRE RESCUE is a litigant

Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant