Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/19/2020 at 19:00:42 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: CLARK, CINDY FAULKNER

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 IN THE INTEREST OF CLARK, CINDY FAULKNER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0725

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

CLARK, ROBERT

Claimant

ST. JOHNS COUNTY FIRE RESCUE

Decedent

CLARK, CINDY FAULKNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WATSON, JEFFREY TODD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: STATEMENT OF CLAIM BY ST. JOHNS COUNTY FIRE RESCUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - Recorded (OR.4838.923 / 2019088824)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.4838.921 / 2019088823)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: WATSON, JEFFREY TODD REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP19-0725, IN THE INTEREST OF: CLARK, CINDY FAULKNER - ORDER OF SUMMARY/ORDER ADMITTING WILL 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2019039326

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: WATSON, JEFFREY TODD ASSIGNED TO CLARK, ROBERT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/21/2019 CASE NUMBER CP19-0725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF WITNESS TO WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. JOHNS COUNTY FIRE RESCUE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Watson, Jeffrey Todd