Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/20/2020 at 01:12:28 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: BISHOP, MARY A

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF BISHOP, MARY A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0423

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

RELIANCE TRUST COMPANY OF DELAWARE

FANCHER, CAROL B

BISHOP, KERMIT O

Decedent

BISHOP, MARY A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

FISHBURNE, JOHN INGRAM III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.4410.262 / 2017051298)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - Recorded (OR.4410.242 / 2017051296)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: FISHBURNE, JOHN INGRAM III REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0423, IN THE INTEREST OF: BISHOP, MARY A WITH 2 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: P97-7/26/2017,P21-7/26/2017- ORDER OF SUMMARY/ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketEntry: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2017023598

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/10/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0423

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESINGATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less