Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 00:36:19 (UTC).

IN THE INTEREST OF: BARTLETT, ALFRED PILLING

Case Summary

On 09/15/2017 IN THE INTEREST OF BARTLETT, ALFRED PILLING was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0549

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

BARTLETT, LISA

Not Yet Classified

BARTLETT, CHERYL

BARTLETT, LISA

Decedent

BARTLETT, ALFRED PILLING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

BOYLAN, PAUL S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE - Recorded (OR.4623.1754 / 2018072953)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BOYLAN, PAUL S REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0549, IN THE INTEREST OF: BARTLETT, ALFRED PILLING WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER OF DISCHARGE-10/8/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: BOYLAN, PAUL S REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CP17-0549, IN THE INTEREST OF: BARTLETT, ALFRED PILLING - NOTICE TO FILE 10/4/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE TO FILE FINAL ACCOUNTING AND PETITION FOR DISCHARGE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISCHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BOYLAN, PAUL S ASSIGNED TO BARTLETT, LISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST - Recorded (OR.4530.827 / 2018024490)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BOYLAN, PAUL S ASSIGNED TO BARTLETT, LISA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017031355

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: DECEASED W/FORMAL ADMIN-UNCONT ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON APPOINTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/15/2017 CASE NUMBER CP17-0549

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATION DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION (INTESTATE)

    Read MoreRead Less