Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 19:06:15 (UTC).

IN RE: WILLIAMS, AMY JEANNE

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 IN RE WILLIAMS, AMY JEANNE was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0005

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, SUSAN COOPER

Not Yet Classified

WILLIAMS, AMY JEANNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHORSTEIN, ALYSSA C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP - Recorded (OR.4884.1189 / 2020012531)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: SHORSTEIN, ALYSSA C REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT GA20-0005, IN RE: WILLIAMS, AMY JEANNE - LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP/ORDER APPOINTING PLENARY GUARDIANSHIP -2/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PLENARY GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON AND PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: SHORSTEIN, ALYSSA C ASSIGNED TO WILLIAMS, SUSAN COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020001482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: ++END OF TRANSFER CASE++

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER RATIFYING AND APPROVING WARD'S MOVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION TO TRANSFER VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: WAIVER OF PREFERENCE, CONSENT TO APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN, AND WAIVER OF NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE SUMMARY FROM PINELLAS COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: GUARDIANSHIP/PERSON & PROPERTY ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/10/2020 CASE NUMBER GA20-0005

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHORSTEIN, ALYSSA C