Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 19:10:57 (UTC).

IN RE: WESLEY E SCHEUFLER ZOUYO TRUST

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 IN RE WESLEY E SCHEUFLER ZOUYO TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0738

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHEUFLER, WESLEY E

Decedent

WESLEY E SCHEUFLER ZOUYO TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

TRUDEAU, ROBERT H

HAY, JONATHAN LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (GUARDIANSHIP); Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: HAY, JONATHAN LEE REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT TA19-0738, IN RE: WESLEY E SCHEUFLER ZOUYO TRUST -FINAL JUDGMENT AUTHORIZING APPOINTMENT OF CO-TRUSTEE AND MODIFICATION OF TRUST-1/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT AUTHORIZING APPOINTMENT OF CO-TRUSTEE AND MODIFICATION OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COURT NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: TRUDEAU, ROBERT H ASSIGNED TO SCHEUFLER, WESLEY E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING- 1/3/2020 @ 10:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2019039860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HAY, JONATHAN LEE ASSIGNED TO SCHEUFLER, WESLEY E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HAY, JONATHAN LEE ASSIGNED TO SCHEIDEL, ROLF H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/26/2019 CASE NUMBER TA19-0738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT AND WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR APPOINTMENT OF CO-TRUSTEE AND MODIFICATION OF TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAY , JONATHAN LEE