This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 03/03/2023 at 08:01:53 (UTC).

IN RE: PACETTI, LINDA HELEN

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 IN RE PACETTI, LINDA HELEN was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANESK, KENNETH J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0377

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANESK, KENNETH J

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

DAVIDSON, PAIGE PACETTI

PACETTI, LINDA HELEN

PACETTI, JOSEPH P

Guardian Ad Litem and Other

BUCHANAN, CONSTANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COPELAND, DANIEL M

Not Yet Classified Attorney

QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA

Guardian Ad Litem and Other Attorney

CALLEY, D CRAIG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketEntry: 1ST AMENDED 2/21/2023 VERIFIED INVENOTRY OF GUARDIAN (INITIAL GUARDIANSHIP REPORT OF GUARDIAN OF PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntry: SECOND AMENDED PETITION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO ACT TO OBTAIN PROPOSAL FOR A REVERSE MORTGAGE ON BEHALF OF WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED PETITION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO ACT TO OBTAIN PROPOSAL FOR A REVERSE MORTGAGE ON BEHALF OF WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO ACT TO OBTAIN PROPOSAL FOR A REVERSE MORTGAGE ON BEHALF OF WARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR AUTHORIZATION TO ACT TO SELL WARD'S MOTOR VESSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: COPELAND, DANIEL M; QUESENBERRY, SUSANNA SAMIA; CALLEY, D CRAIG REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT GA22-0377, IN RE: PACETTI, LINDA HELEN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER APPROVING INITIAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN (12/09/2022-12/31/2023)-2/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPROVING INITIAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN (12/09/2022-12/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO:M. LAPINSKI REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT GA22-0377, IN RE: PACETTI, LINDA HELEN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: OBJECTION TO VERIFIED INVENTORY OF GUARDIAN-2/9/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketEntry: OBJECTION TO VERIFIED INVENTORY OF GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CALLEY, D CRAIG REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT GA22-0377, IN RE: PACETTI, LINDA HELEN: REQUESTED PROPOSED ORDER APPROVING INITIAL PLAN - 2/8/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AND ELISOR FOR ALLEGED INCAPACITATED PERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022040443

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: RELATED CASE: IC22-0345

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: COPELAND, DANIEL M REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT GA22-0377, IN RE: PACETTI, LINDA HELEN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: BACKGROUND CREDIT HISTORY LETTER-10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: BACKGROUND CREDIT HISTORY LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: MEGAN LAPINSKI REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT GA22-0377, IN RE: PACETTI, LINDA HELEN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN-10/26/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: COPELAND, DANIEL M ASSIGNED TO DAVIDSON, PAIGE PACETTI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE JANESK, KENNETH J: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/26/2022 CASE NUMBER GA22-0377

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less