This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 11/22/2021 at 16:08:18 (UTC).

HOMECOMING PROPERTY LLC vs. HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 HOMECOMING PROPERTY LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SMITH, R. LEE and MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0425

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SMITH, R. LEE

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMECOMING PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT #2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

WALDEN CHASE HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT #1

HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/3/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/3/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

4/3/2020: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

4/3/2020: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

4/3/2020: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

4/3/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

4/3/2020: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

4/3/2020: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/03/2020 FOR HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN

4/3/2020: PERSONAL/INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 04/03/2020 FOR HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/24/2020

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: TAROKH, JASON M; MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY; DUFRESNE, DONALD MORGAN REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0425, HOMECOMING PROPERTY LLC VS. HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS - 11/24/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ORDER PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: RECEIPT # 2020028355 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/19/2020

HearingEvent: FORECLOSURE SALE; Judge: CLERKS OFFICE; Location: COUNTY COURTHOUSE; Result: CANCELLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: TAROKH, JASON M; DUFRESNE, DONALD MORGAN; MATTINGLY, KARENA JOY REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA20-0425, HOMECOMING PROPERTY LLC VS. HASSON, KEVIN ALLEN WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: ORDER PLACING CASE ON INACTIVE STATUS-11/17/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: ORDER PLACING CASE ON ACTIVE STATUS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2020

DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $70.00 RECEIPT #2020028355

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
64 More Docket Entries
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT, KEVIN ALLEN HASSON

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF ORIGINAL NOTE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: TAROKH, JASON M ASSIGNED TO HOMECOMING PROPERTY LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020

DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R. LEE: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2020

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/03/2020 CASE NUMBER CA20-0425

[+] Read More [-] Read Less