This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 06/06/2023 at 19:26:58 (UTC).

H&L CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION vs. TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2023 H L CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0275

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

H&L CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Defendant

TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HENDERSON, ALAN D

Defendant Attorney

WOODLEE, JOHN G

 

Court Documents

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/08/2023 FOR TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

3/8/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/08/2023 FOR TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/8/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

3/8/2023: COMPLAINT

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

3/8/2023: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/8/2023: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023009438

3/10/2023: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023009438

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 03/27/2023 FOR TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

3/29/2023: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 03/27/2023 FOR TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

4/27/2023: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

 

Docket Entries

05/02/2023

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: WOODLEE, JOHN G ASSIGNED TO TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/29/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 03/27/2023 FOR TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023009438

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: HENDERSON, ALAN D REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA23-0275, H&L CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION VS. TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC. WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - 3/8/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 03/08/2023 FOR TCS HOME IMPROVEMENTS, INC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: HENDERSON, ALAN D ASSIGNED TO H&L CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/08/2023 CASE NUMBER CA23-0275

[+] Read More [-] Read Less