This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 12/15/2021 at 07:11:47 (UTC).

HILL, CHERI L vs. LODGE AT PONTE VEDRA BEACH LTD

Case Summary

On 05/10/2010 HILL, CHERI L filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against LODGE AT PONTE VEDRA BEACH LTD. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1408

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL, CHERI L

Defendant

LODGE AT PONTE VEDRA BEACH LTD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/18/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL / OR 3378 PG 237

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/2010

DocketEntry: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/05/2010

DocketEntry: ORDER GRANTING DEFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PL'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2010

DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2010

DocketEntry: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE - BANK OF AMERICA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2010

DocketEntry: MOTION TO COMPEL PL'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING DEFT'S OBJECTIONS & ANSWERS TO PL'S 1ST SET OFINTERRS TO DEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2010

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING DEFT'S 1ST SET OF INTERRS TO PL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2010

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD SVD THE LODGE AT PONTE VEDRA BEACH LTD 05-14-10

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2010

DocketEntry: ANSWER FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2010

DocketEntry: ANSWER /THE LODGE AT PONTE VEDRA BEACH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2010

DocketEntry: FILING FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $10.00 BY: HILL, CHERI L ON 05/10/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $400.00 BY: HILL, CHERI L ON 05/10/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2010

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED TO ATTORNEY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2010

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2010

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less