Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 12:15:06 (UTC).

HERBERT, DOUGLAS vs. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/28/2017 HERBERT, DOUGLAS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1407

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERBERT, DOUGLAS

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERCE, JAMES DAVID

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017042543

12/29/2017: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017042543

ORDER UPON FILING

12/28/2017: ORDER UPON FILING

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

12/28/2017: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/27/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT AD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/27/2017: COMPLAINT AD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL; Judge: SMITH, R. LEE; Location: Chambers; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4673.531 / 2019006512)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: KERCE, JAMES DAVID REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-1407, HERBERT, DOUGLAS VS. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION - 1/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL SET FOR 04/08/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN CHAM/ , JDG: SMITH, R LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE SMITH, R LEE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2017042543

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CA/DR SUMMONS ASSESSED $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CONTRACT AND INDEBTNESS ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO SUMMONS ISSUED ON 12/28/2017 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: KERCE, JAMES DAVID ASSIGNED TO HERBERT, DOUGLAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/28/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1407

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT AD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kerce, James David