This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2022 at 14:58:51 (UTC).

GRIDLEY, GARTH vs. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/12/2022 GRIDLEY, GARTH filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MALTZ, HOWARD M.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0898

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MALTZ, HOWARD M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GRIDLEY, GARTH

GRIDLEY, LYNDA

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

2 TAYLOR, ZACHARY MARK

1 CAMPIONE, FRANK J IV

Defendant Attorney

RUSS, ELLIOTT WINSTON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/11/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/11/2022: COMPLAINT

CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/12/2022 FOR AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

7/12/2022: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/12/2022 FOR AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

7/12/2022: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

7/12/2022: STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES IN DIVISION 55

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - RECORDED (OR.5636.1219. / 2022089520)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CAMPIONE, FRANK J IV; TAYLOR, ZACHARY MARK; RUSS, ELLIOTT WINSTON REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA22-0898, GRIDLEY, GARTH VS. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-9/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: RUSS, ELLIOTT WINSTON ASSIGNED TO AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON 07/14/2022 FOR AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022025484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: CAMPIONE, FRANK J IV; TAYLOR, ZACHARY MARK REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA22-0898, GRIDLEY, GARTH VS. AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-7/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AOSC20-23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CORPORATE SUMMONS STATUS SET TO CIVIL SUMMONS ISSUED ON 07/12/2022 FOR AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: TAYLOR, ZACHARY MARK ASSIGNED TO GRIDLEY, LYNDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CAMPIONE, FRANK J IV ASSIGNED TO GRIDLEY, LYNDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: TAYLOR, ZACHARY MARK ASSIGNED TO GRIDLEY, GARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: CAMPIONE, FRANK J IV ASSIGNED TO GRIDLEY, GARTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE MALTZ, HOWARD M.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/12/2022 CASE NUMBER CA22-0898

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Integrity Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUSS, ELLIOTT WINSTON