This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 11/28/2021 at 07:26:02 (UTC).

GARRISON, SYLVIA K vs. GARRISON, MARK

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 GARRISON, SYLVIA K filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GARRISON, MARK. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S and MENSH, DENISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1584

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S

MENSH, DENISE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARRISON, SYLVIA K

Respondent

GARRISON, MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingEvent: HEARING (GM); Judge: MENSH, DENISE; Location: Zoom; Result: CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING BEFORE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - Recorded (OR.5217.485 / 2021032734)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT (FAMILY); Judge: FEREBEE, CHRISTOPHER S; Location: Courtroom 316; Result: COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: ATTORNEY OF RECORD FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATION REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION AND OTHER RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: FAMILY COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: BEARDSLEY, BRANDON D ASSIGNED TO GARRISON, SYLVIA K

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE RENDZIO, BRYAN R.: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF WITHOUT DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/28/2020 CASE NUMBER DR20-1584

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less