Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from St. Johns County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 22:49:47 (UTC).

FUDGE BUCKETS, LLC vs. OLDEST CITY VENTURES, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2017 FUDGE BUCKETS, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against OLDEST CITY VENTURES, INC. This case was filed in St. Johns County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL and SMITH, R. LEE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1277

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    St. Johns County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

SMITH, R. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUDGE BUCKETS, LLC

Defendants

EASTON, GARY A

PINAUD, DONALD JR

EASTON, MICHELLE M

OLDEST CITY VENTURES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

NAPLES, DAVID D JR

SPENCE, JOHN JOSEPH

PINAUD, DONALD E JR

 

Court Documents

AGREED ORDER RELEASING FUNDS

12/23/2019: AGREED ORDER RELEASING FUNDS

MOTION FOR COURT TO APPROVE STIPULATION

5/8/2019: MOTION FOR COURT TO APPROVE STIPULATION

CIVIL COURT NOTES

4/8/2019: CIVIL COURT NOTES

MOTION TO STRIKE JURY TRIAL DEMAND (EXCEPT FOR FRAUD COUNTERCLAIM) MOTION TO BIFURCATE FRAUD COUNTERCLAIM

1/31/2019: MOTION TO STRIKE JURY TRIAL DEMAND (EXCEPT FOR FRAUD COUNTERCLAIM) MOTION TO BIFURCATE FRAUD COUNTERCLAIM

AFFIDAVIT OF GARY EASTON IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

11/9/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF GARY EASTON IN SUPPORT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT

CIVIL COURT NOTES

7/26/2018: CIVIL COURT NOTES

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT PJ DREAMS, LLC AND JULIE LAZECKI'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING

7/9/2018: THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT PJ DREAMS, LLC AND JULIE LAZECKI'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 26, 2018 AT 8:30

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING - JULY 26, 2018 AT 8:30

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COLE SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

7/6/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COLE SCOTT & KISSANE, P.A.

REPLY TO AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

4/11/2018: REPLY TO AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 3 - (SECURITY AGREEMENT)

4/5/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 3 - (SECURITY AGREEMENT)

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 1 - (ASSET PURCHASE CONTRACT)

4/5/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT 1 - (ASSET PURCHASE CONTRACT)

DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT 7 - (COMPOSITE OF PHOTOS)

4/5/2018: DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT 7 - (COMPOSITE OF PHOTOS)

DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT 3 - (GMAIL 11/07/2017)

4/5/2018: DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT 3 - (GMAIL 11/07/2017)

DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT 2 - (SALES REPORTS 2017)

4/5/2018: DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT 2 - (SALES REPORTS 2017)

DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM, THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/2/2018: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM, THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

INTERROGATORIES

2/23/2018: INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

11/22/2017: COMPLAINT

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE - Recorded (OR.4887.697 / 2020013860)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR CHECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMAIL SENT TO: NAPLES, DAVID D JR; PINAUD, DONALD E JR REGARDING SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT CA17-1277, FUDGE BUCKETS, LLC VS. OLDEST CITY VENTURES, INC. WITH 1 ATTACHMENTS FROM DOCKET: AGREED ORDER RELEASING FUNDS-12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER RELEASING FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLIANCE CREATED : RPFD REQUIRED BY: 02/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3,661.50 RECEIPT #2019037656

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: REGISTRY FEE ASSESSED $61.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketEntry: REGISTRY DEPOSIT ASSESSED $3600.00

    Read MoreRead Less
134 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF AGREEMENT REGARDING SERVICE AND RESPONSE DEADLINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2017039067

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER UPON FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: ATTORNEY: NAPLES, DAVID D JR ASSIGNED TO FUDGE BUCKETS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: OTHER CIVIL ASSESSED $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 11/22/2017 CASE NUMBER CA17-1277

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPENCE, JOHN JOSEPH

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAPLES, DAVID D JR