This case was last updated from St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court on 12/16/2021 at 01:17:21 (UTC).

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC vs. CHAMBERS, JUDD

Case Summary

On 07/06/2010 FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHAMBERS, JUDD. This case was filed in St. Johns County - Seventh Judicial Circuit Court, St. Johns County Circuit Court located in St. Johns, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1882

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    St. Johns, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC

Defendant

CHAMBERS, JUDD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/04/2011

DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL AFTER HEARING - Recorded (OR.3491.1 / 2011055782)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/04/2011

DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL AFTER HEARING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2011

DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2011

HearingEvent: MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL; Judge: TRAYNOR, J MICHAEL; Location: Courtroom 305

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2011

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2011

DocketEntry: MOTION, NOTICE AND JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL SET FOR 08/08/2011 AT 8:30 AM IN 305/ , JDG: TRAYNOR, J. MICHAEL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2010

DocketEntry: SUMS RTD UNSVD JUDD CHAMBERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

DocketEntry: FILING FEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $10.00 BY: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 07/06/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

DocketEntry: PAYMENT OF $400.00 BY: FORD MOTOR CREDIT COMPANY LLC ON 07/06/2010

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less